HI HR135 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-04 - Adopted with Representative(s) Okimoto voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nishimoto, Quinlan excused (2).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requesting The Department Of Transportation To Conduct A Feasibility Study On Universal Pilot Badges For Airports In The State.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requesting The Department Of Transportation To Conduct A Feasibility Study On Universal Pilot Badges For Airports In The State.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-04HouseAdopted with Representative(s) Okimoto voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nishimoto, Quinlan excused (2).
2019-04-04HouseReported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2034), recommending adoption.
2019-04-02HouseThe committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ichiyama, Aquino, Cabanilla Arakawa, Kong, Mizuno, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Cachola, Har, Onishi.
2019-03-29HouseResolution scheduled to be heard by CPC on Tuesday, 04-02-19 2:00PM in House conference room 329.
2019-03-28HouseReport adopted; referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, C. Lee excused (2).
2019-03-28HouseReported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1820), recommending referral to CPC.
2019-03-22HouseThe committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, Hashimoto, Brower, Hashem, Matayoshi, Woodson, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Cullen.
2019-03-19HouseResolution scheduled to be heard by TRN on Friday, 03-22-19 10:00AM in conference room 423.
2019-03-14HouseReferred to TRN, CPC, referral sheet 33
2019-03-08HouseOffered

Same As/Similar To

HCR147 (Same As) 2019-04-09 - Referred to TRS/PSM.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback