HI HR125 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-25 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Creagan, Eli, Holt, Nakamura, Quinlan excused (6).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Recognizing April 19 Through 25, 2020, And April 18 Through 24, 2021, As Volunteer Week Hawaii In The State.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Recognizing April 19 Through 25, 2020, And April 18 Through 24, 2021, As Volunteer Week Hawaii In The State.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-25HouseReport adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Creagan, Eli, Holt, Nakamura, Quinlan excused (6).
2019-03-25HouseReported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1722), recommending referral to FIN.
2019-03-19HouseThe committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Eli, Ichiyama, Kitagawa, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) McKelvey, Quinlan.
2019-03-15HouseResolution re-scheduled to be heard by LAB on Tuesday, 03-19-19 9:35AM in conference room 309.
2019-03-15HouseResolution scheduled to be heard by LAB on Tuesday, 03-19-19 9:00AM in conference room 309.
2019-03-14HouseReferred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 33
2019-03-08HouseOffered

Same As/Similar To

HCR135 (Same As) 2019-03-25 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Creagan, Eli, Holt, Nakamura, Quinlan excused (6).

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback