HI HR117 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HR117
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-1)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Monday 03-16-20 2:20PM in conference room 309.
Pending: House Lower and Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Monday 03-16-20 2:20PM in conference room 309.
Pending: House Lower and Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Education To Submit A Report To The Legislature On The Status Of Achieving Act 51, Session Laws Of Hawaii 2018, Mandates For Computer Science Education.
Title
Requesting The Department Of Education To Submit A Report To The Legislature On The Status Of Achieving Act 51, Session Laws Of Hawaii 2018, Mandates For Computer Science Education.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | House | This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Monday 03-16-20 2:20PM in conference room 309. |
2020-03-13 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by LHE on Monday, 03-16-20 2:20PM in conference room 309. |
2020-03-11 | House | Referred to LHE, FIN, referral sheet 40 |
2020-03-06 | House | Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HCR134 (Same As) 2020-03-16 - This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Monday 03-16-20 2:20PM in conference room 309.
HR117 (Carry Over) 2019-04-03 - The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
HR117 (Carry Over) 2019-04-03 - The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HR&billnumber=117&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/HR117_.HTM |