HI HR117 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-03 - The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requesting The Department Of Labor And Industrial Relations To Convene An Interagency Enforcement Task Force To Combat Illegal Activities Related To The Construction And Operations Of "monster Homes" In The State.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requesting The Department Of Labor And Industrial Relations To Convene An Interagency Enforcement Task Force To Combat Illegal Activities Related To The Construction And Operations Of "monster Homes" In The State.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-03HouseThe committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
2019-04-01HouseResolution scheduled to be heard by JUD on Wednesday, 04-03-19 2:00PM in conference room 325.
2019-03-25HouseReport adopted. referred to the committee(s) on JUD as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Creagan, Eli, Holt, Nakamura, Quinlan excused (6).
2019-03-25HouseReported from HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1716) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to JUD.
2019-03-21HouseThe committees on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Brower, Matayoshi, Cullen, Hashem, Hashimoto, Woodson; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino, McDermott.
2019-03-18HouseResolution scheduled to be heard by HSG on Thursday, 03-21-19 10:35AM in conference room 423.
2019-03-14HouseReferred to HSG, JUD, referral sheet 33
2019-03-08HouseOffered

Same As/Similar To

HCR127 (Same As) 2019-04-03 - The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback