HI HR115 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-12 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-12 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The Establishment Of A Work Group To Examine Social Determinants Of Health And Risk Adjustment For Medicaid, Gap-group, And Uninsured Individuals.
Title
Social Determinants Work Group; Health and Risk Adjustment
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-12 | House | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2013-04-12 | House | Adopted as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Har, McDermott, Oshiro, Tokioka excused (4). |
2013-04-12 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1713) as amended in HD 1, recommending adoption. |
2013-04-10 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Kawakami, Brower, Cachola, Evans, C. Lee, Tsuji, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 7 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Cabanilla, Carroll, Har, Ito, Yamane, McDermott. |
2013-04-05 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 04-10-13 2:10PM in conference room 325. |
2013-04-02 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Carroll excused (1). |
2013-04-02 | House | Reported from HUS/HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1320), recommending referral to CPC. |
2013-03-28 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Morikawa, Carroll, Jordan, Kobayashi, Woodson; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla, Cheape. |
2013-03-28 | House | The committees on HUS recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Carroll, Kobayashi, Belatti, Jordan, Morikawa, Woodson; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla, Fukumoto. |
2013-03-25 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by HUS/HLT on Thursday, 03-28-13 10:30AM in conference room 329. |
2013-03-18 | House | Referred to HUS/HLT, CPC, referral sheet 39 |
2013-03-13 | House | Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HCR146 (Same As) 2013-05-02 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HR&billnumber=115&year=2013 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2013/Bills/HR115_.HTM |