HI HR106 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HR106
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-23 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on JHA as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1).
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-23 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on JHA as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1).
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Designating May 17, 2021, As Diffuse Intrinsic Pontine Glioma Awareness Day.
Title
Designating May 17, 2021, As Diffuse Intrinsic Pontine Glioma Awareness Day.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-17 - House - House Culture, Arts, & International Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-23 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on JHA as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1). |
2021-03-23 | House | Reported from CAI (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1174) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to JHA. |
2021-03-17 | House | The committees on CAI recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Gates, LoPresti, Har, Kapela, Nishimoto, Tam, Yamane, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2021-03-16 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by CAI on Wednesday, 03-17-21 9:30AM in conference room 329 Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-15 | House | Referred to CAI, JHA, referral sheet 25 |
2021-03-12 | House | Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HR106 (Carry Over) 2021-03-23 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on JHA as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1).