HI HR106 | 2020 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous HR106

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-4)
Status: Introduced on March 5 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-11 - Referred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 40
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Urging The President Of The United States, United States Congress, United States Department Of Health And Human Services, And United States Centers For Disease Control And Prevention To Fully Support Hawaii In The Screening, Prevention, And Containment Of Covid-19.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Urging The President Of The United States, United States Congress, United States Department Of Health And Human Services, And United States Centers For Disease Control And Prevention To Fully Support Hawaii In The Screening, Prevention, And Containment Of Covid-19.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-11HouseReferred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 40
2020-03-06HouseOffered
2020-03-05HouseTo be offered.

Same As/Similar To

HCR127 (Same As) 2020-03-11 - Referred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 40
HR106 (Carry Over) 2019-03-28 - Resolution adopted in final form.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback