HI HR106 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HR106
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-28 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-28 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Convening A Gambling Advisory Group To Examine And Assess The Impacts Of Growing Access To Online And Illegal Gambling In Hawaii.
Title
Convening A Gambling Advisory Group To Examine And Assess The Impacts Of Growing Access To Online And Illegal Gambling In Hawaii.
Sponsors
Sen. Chris Lee [D] | Rep. Richard Creagan [D] | Rep. John Mizuno [D] | Rep. Daynette Morikawa [D] |
Sen. Joy San Buenaventura [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-28 | House | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2019-03-28 | House | Adopted as amended in HD 1 with Representative(s) Okimoto voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Ward voting no (1) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, C. Lee excused (2). |
2019-03-28 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1899) as amended in HD 1, recommending adoption. |
2019-03-22 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Lowen, McKelvey, Morikawa, Takayama; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Thielen; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Creagan, Say, Yamane. |
2019-03-20 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by JUD on Friday, 03-22-19 2:10PM in conference room 325. |
2019-03-14 | House | Referred to JUD, referral sheet 33 |
2019-03-08 | House | Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HR106 (Carry Over) 2019-03-28 - Resolution adopted in final form.
HCR116 (Same As) 2019-03-29 - Referred to GVO/CPH.
HCR116 (Same As) 2019-03-29 - Referred to GVO/CPH.