HI HR105 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HR105
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-2)
Status: Passed on April 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-04 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-2)
Status: Passed on April 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-04 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Convening The Multiple Languages Emergency Notification Working Group.
Title
Convening The Multiple Languages Emergency Notification Working Group.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-04 | House | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2019-04-04 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nishimoto, Quinlan excused (2). |
2019-04-04 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1997), recommending adoption. |
2019-04-03 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Hashimoto, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Gates, Holt. |
2019-04-01 | House | Scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 04-03-19 11:30AM in conference room 308. |
2019-03-27 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Creagan, DeCoite, Holt, McKelvey excused (4). |
2019-03-27 | House | Reported from PVM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1756) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to FIN. |
2019-03-20 | House | The committees on PVM recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Takayama, Gates, D. Kobayashi, Kong, Nishimoto, Ohno, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2019-03-18 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by PVM on Wednesday, 03-20-19 11:00AM in conference room 430. |
2019-03-14 | House | Referred to PVM, FIN, referral sheet 33 |
2019-03-08 | House | Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HR105 (Carry Over) 2019-04-04 - Resolution adopted in final form.
HCR113 (Same As) 2019-05-02 - Resolution adopted in final form.
HCR113 (Same As) 2019-05-02 - Resolution adopted in final form.