HI HR104 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-07 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-07 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Real Estate Commission To Study The Effectiveness Of Its Existing Dispute Resolution Process And Consumer Assistance Program For Condominium Owners And Associations, And Possible Expansion Of These Services To Other Types Of Homeowners Associations.
Title
Dispute Resolution; Condominiums; Study
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] | Rep. Della au Belatti [D] | Rep. Tom Brower [D] | Rep. Scott Nishimoto [D] |
Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-07 | House | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2016-04-07 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott, Oshiro, Thielen, Tupola excused (4). |
2016-04-07 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1565-16), recommending adoption. |
2016-04-05 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2016-04-05 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2016-04-01 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 04-05-16 2:15PM in House conference room 308. |
2016-03-29 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Ing, Kong, Luke, Saiki, Thielen, Tokioka excused (7). |
2016-03-29 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1415-16) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to FIN. |
2016-03-28 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Woodson, Belatti, Brower, Creagan, Har, Hashem, Nakashima, San Buenaventura, Takayama, Fukumoto Chang, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Kawakami, C. Lee, Oshiro, Yamane. |
2016-03-24 | House | Scheduled for decision making on Monday, 03-28-16 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2016-03-23 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-28-16 at 2:00 PM. |
2016-03-21 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 03-23-16 2:30PM in conference room 325. |
2016-03-14 | House | Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 28 |
2016-03-11 | House | Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HCR152 (Same As) 2016-04-08 - Referred to CPH.