HI HR102 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HR102
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-29 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, Oshiro, Say, Thielen excused (4).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-29 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, Oshiro, Say, Thielen excused (4).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Public Safety To Include Sites That Are 4.5 Acres Or Larger In The Environmental Impact Statement Process For The Oahu Community Correctional Center Relocation.
Title
Requesting The Department Of Public Safety To Include Sites That Are 4.5 Acres Or Larger In The Environmental Impact Statement Process For The Oahu Community Correctional Center Relocation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-29 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, Oshiro, Say, Thielen excused (4). |
2017-03-29 | House | Reported from PBS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1401), recommending referral to FIN. |
2017-03-23 | House | The committees on PBS recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Takayama, LoPresti, Creagan, DeCoite, Gates, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ing. |
2017-03-17 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by PBS on Thursday, 03-23-17 10:00AM in conference room 312. |
2017-03-14 | House | Referred to PBS, FIN, referral sheet 30 |
2017-03-10 | House | Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HR102 (Carry Over) 2017-03-29 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, Oshiro, Say, Thielen excused (4).
HCR156 (Same As) 2017-03-29 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, Oshiro, Say, Thielen excused (4).
HCR156 (Same As) 2017-03-29 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, Oshiro, Say, Thielen excused (4).
Subjects
Department of Public Safety
Environmental Impact Statement
Oahu Community Correctional Center
Potential Sites
Environmental Impact Statement
Oahu Community Correctional Center
Potential Sites
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HR&billnumber=102&year=2017 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2017/bills/HR102_.HTM |