HI HR100 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HR100
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-31 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-31 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Legislative Reference Bureau To Conduct An Analysis Of Advanced Practice Registered Nurses And Physician Assistants.
Title
Requesting The Legislative Reference Bureau To Conduct An Analysis Of Advanced Practice Registered Nurses And Physician Assistants.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-19 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-31 | House | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2021-03-30 | House | Adopted as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Todd excused (1). |
2021-03-30 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1530) as amended in HD 1, recommending adoption. |
2021-03-19 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Kitagawa, Har, Hashem, Kong, Mizuno, Morikawa, Onishi, Tarnas, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino. |
2021-03-17 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by CPC on Friday, 03-19-21 2:00PM in conference room 329 Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-15 | House | Referred to CPC, referral sheet 25 |
2021-03-12 | House | Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HR100 (Carry Over) 2021-03-31 - Resolution adopted in final form.
HCR124 (Same As) 2021-03-31 - Referred to CPN/GVO.
HCR124 (Same As) 2021-03-31 - Referred to CPN/GVO.