HI HCR96 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HCR96
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-2)
Status: Passed on April 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-24 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-2)
Status: Passed on April 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-24 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Budget And Finance To Provide A Status Report On The Hawaii Able Savings Program.
Title
Requesting The Department Of Budget And Finance To Provide A Status Report On The Hawaii Able Savings Program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-24 | House | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2017-04-24 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 693). |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1718) with recommendation of adoption. |
2017-04-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) K. Kahele. |
2017-04-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 04-18-17 9:30AM in conference room 211. |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Referred to WAM. |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 417). |
2017-04-05 | House | Transmitted to Senate. |
2017-04-05 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2017-04-05 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1609), recommending adoption. |
2017-04-04 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, Choy, DeCoite, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Nakamura, Tokioka, Yamashita, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Gates, Quinlan, Ward. |
2017-03-31 | House | Scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 04-04-17 10:35AM in conference room 308. |
2017-03-29 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, Oshiro, Say, Thielen excused (4). |
2017-03-29 | House | Reported from HUS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1404), recommending referral to FIN. |
2017-03-22 | House | The committees on HUS recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Morikawa, Todd, Belatti, Kobayashi, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Har, Oshiro. |
2017-03-20 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2017-03-20 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by HUS on Wednesday, 03-22-17 10:30AM in conference room 329. |
2017-03-13 | House | Referred to HUS, FIN, referral sheet 29 |
2017-03-09 | House | Offered |
2017-03-08 | House | To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HCR96 (Carry Over) 2017-04-24 - Resolution adopted in final form.
HR58 (Same As) 2017-04-05 - Resolution adopted in final form.
HR58 (Same As) 2017-04-05 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HCR&billnumber=96&year=2017 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2017/bills/HCR96_.HTM |