HI HCR93 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HCR93
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-29 - Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 940).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-29 - Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 940).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The City And County Of Honolulu To Purchase Certain Tax Map Key Parcels To Be Used For Additional Parking And Other Community Needs, As Deemed Necessary By The City And County Of Honolulu.
Title
Requesting The City And County Of Honolulu To Purchase Certain Tax Map Key Parcels To Be Used For Additional Parking And Other Community Needs, As Deemed Necessary By The City And County Of Honolulu.
Sponsors
Rep. Adrian Tam [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-22 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-22 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - House - House Water & Land: Passed, Unamended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-22 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - House - House Water & Land: Passed, Unamended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-29 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 940). |
2022-04-29 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House. |
2022-04-28 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-29-22. |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Reported from TRS/WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 4075) with recommendation of adoption. |
2022-04-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WTL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Keith-Agaran, Misalucha, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2022-04-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in TRS were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Lee, Inouye, DeCoite, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2022-04-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRS/WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 04-22-22 10:15AM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference. |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Referred to TRS/WTL. |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 376). |
2022-03-31 | House | Transmitted to Senate. |
2022-03-31 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, D. Kobayashi, Ohno excused (3). |
2022-03-31 | House | Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1648-22), recommending adoption. |
2022-03-29 | House | The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Branco, Ganaden, B. Kobayashi, Kong, Morikawa, Ohno; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott. |
2022-03-24 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by WAL on Tuesday, 03-29-22 9:00AM in conference room 430 Via Videoconference. |
2022-03-14 | House | Referred to WAL, referral sheet 27 |
2022-03-11 | House | Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HR87 (Same As) 2022-03-31 - Resolution adopted in final form.
HCR93 (Carry Over) 2021-03-15 - Referred to PDP, JHA, referral sheet 25
HCR93 (Carry Over) 2021-03-15 - Referred to PDP, JHA, referral sheet 25