HI HCR91 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-28 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, C. Lee excused (2).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requesting The Public Utilities Commission To Collaborate With The Division Of Consumer Advocacy, Electric Utilities, And Other Stakeholders To Explore Cost-effective Solutions To Lessen The Burden Of Energy Costs On Low- And Limited-income And Special Medical Needs Customers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requesting The Public Utilities Commission To Collaborate With The Division Of Consumer Advocacy, Electric Utilities, And Other Stakeholders To Explore Cost-effective Solutions To Lessen The Burden Of Energy Costs On Low- And Limited-income And Special Medical Needs Customers.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-28HouseReport adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, C. Lee excused (2).
2019-03-28HouseReported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1809) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to FIN.
2019-03-21HouseThe committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ichiyama, Aquino, Cachola, Har, Kong, Onishi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Cabanilla Arakawa, Mizuno.
2019-03-18HouseResolution scheduled to be heard by CPC on Thursday, 03-21-19 2:00PM in conference room 329.
2019-03-14HouseReferred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 33
2019-03-08HouseOffered

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback