HI HCR89 | 2020 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous HCR89

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-16 - This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Monday 03-16-20 2:00PM in conference room 309.
Pending: House Lower and Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requesting The Convening Of A Working Group To Examine The Feasibility And Economic Impact Of Creating A Health Policy Institute At The University Of Hawaii At Manoa.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requesting The Convening Of A Working Group To Examine The Feasibility And Economic Impact Of Creating A Health Policy Institute At The University Of Hawaii At Manoa.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-16HouseThis measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Monday 03-16-20 2:00PM in conference room 309.
2020-03-13HouseResolution scheduled to be heard by LHE/HLT on Monday, 03-16-20 2:00PM in conference room 309.
2020-03-11HouseReferred to LHE/HLT, FIN, referral sheet 40
2020-03-05HouseOffered
2020-03-04HouseTo be offered.

Same As/Similar To

HR70 (Same As) 2020-03-16 - This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Monday 03-16-20 2:00PM in conference room 309.
HCR89 (Carry Over) 2019-04-22 - Resolution adopted in final form.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback