HI HCR87 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-22 - The committee(s) on HSH recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Human Services & Homelessness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Urging The Executive Office On Aging To Work With The University Of Hawaii Center On Aging To Establish An Active Aging Initiative And Active Aging Advisory Committee.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Urging The Executive Office On Aging To Work With The University Of Hawaii Center On Aging To Establish An Active Aging Initiative And Active Aging Advisory Committee.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-22HouseThe committee(s) on HSH recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
2019-03-19HouseResolution scheduled to be heard by HSH on Friday, 03-22-19 8:30AM in conference room 329.
2019-03-14HouseReferred to HSH, FIN, referral sheet 33
2019-03-08HouseOffered

Same As/Similar To

HR84 (Same As) 2019-03-22 - The committee(s) on HSH recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback