HI HCR86 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HCR86
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-24 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on CPC as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-24 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on CPC as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Auditor, Hawaii Employer-union Health Benefits Trust Fund, And Med-quest Division Of The Department Of Human Services To Provide Information To The Legislature Regarding The Costs And Benefits Of Relying On A Single Provider To Fulfill Prescription Medication.
Title
Requesting The Auditor, Hawaii Employer-union Health Benefits Trust Fund, And Med-quest Division Of The Department Of Human Services To Provide Information To The Legislature Regarding The Costs And Benefits Of Relying On A Single Provider To Fulfill Prescription Medication.
Sponsors
Rep. Ryan Yamane [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-23 - House - House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-24 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on CPC as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2021-03-24 | House | Reported from HHH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1291) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to CPC. |
2021-03-23 | House | The committees on HHH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Tam, Gates, Har, Kapela, Nishimoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) LoPresti. |
2021-03-18 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by HHH on Tuesday, 03-23-21 9:00AM in conference room 329 Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-15 | House | Referred to HHH, CPC, referral sheet 25 |
2021-03-12 | House | Offered |
2021-03-11 | House | To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HCR86 (Carry Over) 2021-03-24 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on CPC as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
SCR114 (Same As) 2021-03-25 - The committee on LCA deferred the measure.
SCR114 (Same As) 2021-03-25 - The committee on LCA deferred the measure.