HI HCR84 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HCR84
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-31 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Hashem, D. Kobayashi, Ohno excused (4).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-31 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Hashem, D. Kobayashi, Ohno excused (4).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Business, Economic Development, And Tourism To Conduct A Study On The "made In Hawaii" And "hawaii Made" Brands And Prepare A Plan To Encourage And Enforce The Use Of Those Brands.
Title
Requesting The Department Of Business, Economic Development, And Tourism To Conduct A Study On The "made In Hawaii" And "hawaii Made" Brands And Prepare A Plan To Encourage And Enforce The Use Of Those Brands.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-30 - House - House Economic Development: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-31 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Hashem, D. Kobayashi, Ohno excused (4). |
2022-03-31 | House | Reported from ECD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1597-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to FIN. |
2022-03-30 | House | The committees on ECD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Quinlan, Holt, Onishi, Sayama, Takayama; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, D. Kobayashi, Okimoto. |
2022-03-24 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by ECD on Wednesday, 03-30-22 10:00AM in conference room 312 Via Videoconference. |
2022-03-14 | House | Referred to ECD, FIN, referral sheet 27 |
2022-03-11 | House | Offered |
2022-03-10 | House | To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HR75 (Same As) 2022-03-31 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Hashem, D. Kobayashi, Ohno excused (4).
HCR84 (Carry Over) 2021-04-20 - Resolution adopted in final form.
SCR22 (Same As) 2022-04-18 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ohno, Woodson excused (2).
HCR84 (Carry Over) 2021-04-20 - Resolution adopted in final form.
SCR22 (Same As) 2022-04-18 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ohno, Woodson excused (2).
Subjects
Department of Business, Economic Development, and Tourism
Hawaii Made Brand
Made in Hawaii Brand
Plan
Study
Hawaii Made Brand
Made in Hawaii Brand
Plan
Study