HI HCR82 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-27 - (H) Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-27 - (H) Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Supporting Efforts By Non-governmental Organizations That Assist In Finding Opportunities And Solutions To Address Homelessness In Hawaii.
Title
Homelessness; Non-governmental Organizations
Sponsors
Rep. Karen Awana [D] | Rep. Faye Hanohano [D] | Rep. Mark Hashem [D] | Sen. Chris Lee [D] |
Rep. Joey Manahan [D] | Rep. John Mizuno [D] | Rep. Mark Nakashima [D] | Rep. Clift Tsuji [D] |
Rep. Jessica Wooley [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-27 | (H) Resolution adopted in final form. | |
2012-04-27 | (H) Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 818). | |
2012-04-27 | (S) Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House. | |
2012-04-26 | (S) One Day Notice 04-27-12. | |
2012-04-26 | (S) Reported from HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3571) with recommendation of adoption. | |
2012-04-23 | (S) The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HMS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Green, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara. | |
2012-04-19 | (S) The committee(s) on HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 04-23-12 11:00AM in conference room 229. | |
2012-04-16 | (S) Referred to HMS. | |
2012-04-16 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 577). | |
2012-04-13 | (H) Transmitted to Senate. | |
2012-04-13 | (H) Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Chang, Kawakami, Oshiro, Tokioka excused (4). | |
2012-04-13 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1726-12), recommending adoption. | |
2012-04-11 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Oshiro, M. Lee, Choy, Cullen, Giugni, Har, Hashem, C. Lee, Morikawa, Tokioka, Yamashita, Marumoto, Riviere, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Ichiyama, Jordan, Kawakami. | |
2012-04-09 | (H) Scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 04-11-12 11:15AM in conference room 308. | |
2012-03-30 | (H) Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Carroll, Herkes, Manahan, Wooley excused (4). | |
2012-03-30 | (H) Reported from HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1387-12), recommending referral to FIN. | |
2012-03-21 | (H) The committees on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Cabanilla, Ito, Chang, Coffman, Har, Kawakami, Nakashima, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Carroll, Herkes, Pine. | |
2012-03-19 | (H) Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org | |
2012-03-19 | (H) Resolution scheduled to be heard by HSG on Wednesday, 03-21-12 9:00AM in conference room 325. | |
2012-03-09 | (H) Referred to HSG, FIN, referral sheet 42 | |
2012-03-08 | (H) Offered | |
2012-03-07 | (H) To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HR57 (Same As) 2012-04-13 - (H) Resolution adopted in final form.