HI HCR79 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Re-referred to EDB, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 36
Pending: House Economic Development & Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requesting The Department Of Business, Economic Development, And Tourism To Study The Feasibility Of Creating An Independent County On The Island Of Molokai.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requesting The Department Of Business, Economic Development, And Tourism To Study The Feasibility Of Creating An Independent County On The Island Of Molokai.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-18HouseRe-referred to EDB, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 36
2019-03-14HouseReferred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 33
2019-03-08HouseOffered
2019-03-07HouseTo be offered.

Same As/Similar To

HR77 (Same As) 2019-03-18 - Re-referred to EDB, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 36

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback