HI HCR78 | 2020 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous HCR78

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on March 3 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-10 - Referred to WLH/EEP, FIN, referral sheet 39
Pending: House Water, Land, & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Urging The Department Of Land And Natural Resources To Address Microplastics By Designating Personnel, Implementing Technology, And Establishing A Pilot Project At Kailua Beach Park To Deploy And Test New Sand-cleaning Technologies For Statewide Use.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Urging The Department Of Land And Natural Resources To Address Microplastics By Designating Personnel, Implementing Technology, And Establishing A Pilot Project At Kailua Beach Park To Deploy And Test New Sand-cleaning Technologies For Statewide Use.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-10HouseReferred to WLH/EEP, FIN, referral sheet 39
2020-03-05HouseOffered
2020-03-03HouseTo be offered.

Same As/Similar To

HR61 (Same As) 2020-03-10 - Referred to WLH/EEP, FIN, referral sheet 39
HCR78 (Carry Over) 2019-03-14 - Referred to HLT/IAC, CPC, referral sheet 33

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback