HI HCR77 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HCR77
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-10 - Referred to TRN, FIN, referral sheet 39
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-10 - Referred to TRN, FIN, referral sheet 39
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Transportation And Kauai Department Of Public Works To Conduct A Study To Identify And Recommend Methods To Alleviate Traffic Congestion At Certain Intersections Along The Kaumualii Highway.
Title
Requesting The Department Of Transportation And Kauai Department Of Public Works To Conduct A Study To Identify And Recommend Methods To Alleviate Traffic Congestion At Certain Intersections Along The Kaumualii Highway.
Sponsors
Rep. Daynette Morikawa [D] | Sen. Henry Aquino [D] | Sen. Troy Hashimoto [D] | Rep. Nadine Nakamura [D] |
Rep. James Tokioka [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | House | Referred to TRN, FIN, referral sheet 39 |
2020-03-05 | House | Offered |
2020-03-03 | House | To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HR60 (Same As) 2020-03-10 - Referred to TRN, FIN, referral sheet 39
HCR77 (Carry Over) 2019-03-14 - Referred to TRN, FIN, referral sheet 33
HCR77 (Carry Over) 2019-03-14 - Referred to TRN, FIN, referral sheet 33
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HCR&billnumber=77&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/HCR77_.HTM |