HI HCR75 | 2020 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous HCR75

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on March 3 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-10 - Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 39
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requesting The Office Of The Clerk Of Each County To Designate And Establish Additional Voter Service Centers At Appropriate Locations For The 2020 Elections.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requesting The Office Of The Clerk Of Each County To Designate And Establish Additional Voter Service Centers At Appropriate Locations For The 2020 Elections.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-10HouseReferred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 39
2020-03-05HouseOffered
2020-03-03HouseTo be offered.

Same As/Similar To

HCR75 (Carry Over) 2019-03-14 - Referred to LHE, FIN, referral sheet 33

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback