HI HCR7 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-14 - Referred to HTH/PSM, JDL/WAM.
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizing The Formation Of A Task Force To Study The Issue Of A Cancer Presumptive Statute Relating To Firefighters.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Fire Council Package; Firefighters; Cancer; Task Force; Establishment

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-04-14SenateReferred to HTH/PSM, JDL/WAM.
2015-04-09SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 368).
2015-04-09HouseTransmitted to Senate.
2015-04-09HouseAdopted as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Tokioka excused (1).
2015-04-09HouseReported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1407) as amended in HD 2, recommending adoption.
2015-04-01HouseThe committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Woodson, Belatti, Brower, Creagan, Hashem, Oshiro, San Buenaventura, Takayama, Fukumoto Chang; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 6 Excused: Representative(s) Har, Kawakami, C. Lee, Nakashima, Yamane, McDermott.
2015-04-02HouseThis measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Monday 04-06-15 2:00PM in conference room 325.
2015-04-01HouseScheduled for decision making on Monday, 04-06-15 2:00PM in conference room 325.
2015-03-30HouseResolution scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 04-01-15 2:30PM in conference room 325.
2015-03-20HouseReport adopted. referred to the committee(s) on CPC as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kawakami, LoPresti, Luke, Oshiro, Saiki, Thielen excused (6).
2015-03-20HouseReported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 993) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to CPC.
2015-03-13HouseThe committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Creagan, Kobayashi, Morikawa, Fukumoto Chang; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Hashem, Jordan, Oshiro, Tupola.
2015-03-11HouseScheduled for decision making on Friday, 03-13-15 11:30AM in conference room 329.
2015-03-11HouseThe committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-13-15 at 11:30am.
2015-03-09HouseResolution scheduled to be heard by HLT on Wednesday, 03-11-15 9:00AM in conference room 329.
2015-02-03HouseReferred to HLT, CPC, referral sheet 7
2015-01-23HouseOffered
2015-01-22HouseTo be offered.

Same As/Similar To

SCR6 (Same As) 2015-01-28 - Referred to HTH/PSM, JDL/WAM.

Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback