HI HCR7 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-3)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-04 - (H) Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on HED with none voting no and Carroll, M. Oshiro, Takai, Tokioka excused.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Encouraging The John A. Burns School Of Medicine And The School Of Nursing And Dental Hygiene Of The University Of Hawaii To Include Breastfeeding In Educational Curriculum To Educate Medical Professionals To Advocate And Promote Breastfeeding Among Expectant Mothers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Breastfeeding; Inclusion in Medical and Nursing Curriculum at University of Hawaii

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-04-04 (H) Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on HED with none voting no and Carroll, M. Oshiro, Takai, Tokioka excused.
2011-04-04 (H) Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1305), recommending referral to HED.
2011-03-29 (H) The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Morikawa, Belatti, Hanohano, Jordan, Mizuno, Wooley, Ching, Pine; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) C. Lee.
2011-03-24 (H) Resolution scheduled to be heard by HLT on Tuesday, 03-29-11 9:00AM in conference room 329.
2011-01-31 (H) Referred to HLT, HED, FIN, referral sheet 5
2011-01-28 (H) Offered
2011-01-27 (H) To be offered.

Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback