HI HCR68 | 2020 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous HCR68

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-10 - Referred to PVM, FIN, referral sheet 39
Pending: House Public Safety, Veterans, & Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requesting The Legislative Reference Bureau To Conduct A Study Of The Impact Of The Military On Hawaii's Economy.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requesting The Legislative Reference Bureau To Conduct A Study Of The Impact Of The Military On Hawaii's Economy.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-10HouseReferred to PVM, FIN, referral sheet 39
2020-03-03HouseOffered
2020-03-02HouseTo be offered.

Same As/Similar To

HR51 (Same As) 2020-03-10 - Referred to PVM, FIN, referral sheet 39
HCR68 (Carry Over) 2019-03-14 - Referred to TRN/PVM, JUD, referral sheet 33

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback