HI HCR65 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HCR65
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-10 - Referred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 39
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-10 - Referred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 39
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Recognizing And Supporting Ongoing Collaborative Efforts Between The Department Of Health, Hep Free Hawaii, And Others To Produce A Statewide Plan To Eliminate Viral Hepatitis In Hawaii.
Title
Recognizing And Supporting Ongoing Collaborative Efforts Between The Department Of Health, Hep Free Hawaii, And Others To Produce A Statewide Plan To Eliminate Viral Hepatitis In Hawaii.
Sponsors
Rep. John Mizuno [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | House | Referred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 39 |
2020-03-03 | House | Offered |
2020-02-28 | House | To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HR50 (Same As) 2020-03-10 - Referred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 39
HCR65 (Carry Over) 2019-03-28 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on JUD as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, C. Lee excused (2).
HCR65 (Carry Over) 2019-03-28 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on JUD as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, C. Lee excused (2).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HCR&billnumber=65&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/HCR65_.HTM |