HI HCR63 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HCR63
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-10 - Referred to EEP/PVM, FIN, referral sheet 39
Pending: House Energy & Environmental Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-10 - Referred to EEP/PVM, FIN, referral sheet 39
Pending: House Energy & Environmental Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Supporting A Feasibility Assessment For Reef Insurance And Recommendations For Nature-based Solutions To Protect Hawaiis Coastlines And Coastal Infrastructure From Natural Disasters.
Title
Supporting A Feasibility Assessment For Reef Insurance And Recommendations For Nature-based Solutions To Protect Hawaiis Coastlines And Coastal Infrastructure From Natural Disasters.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | House | Referred to EEP/PVM, FIN, referral sheet 39 |
2020-02-28 | House | Offered |
2020-02-27 | House | To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HR47 (Same As) 2020-03-10 - Referred to EEP/PVM, FIN, referral sheet 39
HCR63 (Carry Over) 2019-04-02 - The committee(s) on IAC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
HCR63 (Carry Over) 2019-04-02 - The committee(s) on IAC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Subjects
Department of Land and Natural Resources
Department of Transportation
Feasibility Assessment
Hawaii Climate Change Mitigation and Adaptation Commission
Reef Insurance
The Nature Conservancy
Department of Transportation
Feasibility Assessment
Hawaii Climate Change Mitigation and Adaptation Commission
Reef Insurance
The Nature Conservancy
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HCR&billnumber=63&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/HCR63_.HTM |