HI HCR61 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HCR61
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Wednesday 03-18-20 10:00AM in conference room 325.
Pending: House Water, Land, & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Wednesday 03-18-20 10:00AM in conference room 325.
Pending: House Water, Land, & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Counties And Department Of Health To Continue To Work On Sustainable Water Measures And Support Ongoing Water Conservation Efforts.
Title
Requesting The Counties And Department Of Health To Continue To Work On Sustainable Water Measures And Support Ongoing Water Conservation Efforts.
Sponsors
Rep. Ryan Yamane [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | House | This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Wednesday 03-18-20 10:00AM in conference room 325. |
2020-03-13 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by WLH on Wednesday, 03-18-20 10:00AM in conference room 325. |
2020-03-10 | House | Referred to WLH, FIN, referral sheet 39 |
2020-02-28 | House | Offered |
2020-02-27 | House | To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HCR61 (Carry Over) 2019-03-28 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, C. Lee excused (2).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HCR&billnumber=61&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/HCR61_.HTM |