HI HCR61 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-28 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, C. Lee excused (2).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requesting The Department Of Education To Report To The Legislature On Its Progress Toward Providing A Well-rounded Education For All Public School Students.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requesting The Department Of Education To Report To The Legislature On Its Progress Toward Providing A Well-rounded Education For All Public School Students.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-28HouseReport adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, C. Lee excused (2).
2019-03-28HouseReported from LHE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1786), recommending referral to FIN.
2019-03-18HouseThe committees on LHE recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Perruso, DeCoite, D. Kobayashi, Ohno, Quinlan, Tarnas; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Hashem, Johanson, Tokioka, Okimoto.
2019-03-14HouseResolution scheduled to be heard by LHE on Monday, 03-18-19 2:00PM in conference room 309.
2019-03-14HouseReferred to LHE, FIN, referral sheet 33
2019-03-08HouseOffered
2019-03-07HouseTo be offered.

Same As/Similar To

HR62 (Same As) 2019-03-28 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, C. Lee excused (2).

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback