HI HCR60 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-03 - Referred to TCA/PSM.
Pending: Senate Transportation and Culture and the Arts Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-03 - Referred to TCA/PSM.
Pending: Senate Transportation and Culture and the Arts Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The Department Of Transportation To Work With The City And County Of Honolulu To Plan And Implement Options For Alternative Ingress And Egress Routes In Pacific Palisades.
Title
Urging The Department Of Transportation To Work With The City And County Of Honolulu To Plan And Implement Options For Alternative Ingress And Egress Routes In Pacific Palisades.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-03 | Senate | Referred to TCA/PSM. |
2024-04-01 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 479). |
2024-03-28 | House | Transmitted to Senate. |
2024-03-28 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates, Ichiyama, Kila, Lowen, Tam excused (5). |
2024-03-28 | House | Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1543-24), recommending adoption. |
2024-03-21 | House | The committee on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Todd, Kila, Aiu, Evslin, Kitagawa, Miyake, Onishi; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Matsumoto. |
2024-03-15 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by TRN on Thursday, 03-21-24 10:30AM in conference room 312 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-03-08 | House | Referred to TRN, referral sheet 18 |
2024-03-07 | House | Offered |
2024-03-05 | House | To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HR43 (Same As) 2024-03-28 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HCR&billnumber=60&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/HCR60_.HTM |