HI HCR60 | 2020 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous HCR60

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-10 - Referred to LAB/TRN, FIN, referral sheet 39
Pending: House Labor & Public Employment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requesting The Department Of Labor And Industrial Relations, In Collaboration With The Department Of Transportation, To Submit A Report Determining The Revenue, Benefits, And Wage Practices Of Concessionaires At Daniel K. Inouye International Airport.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requesting The Department Of Labor And Industrial Relations, In Collaboration With The Department Of Transportation, To Submit A Report Determining The Revenue, Benefits, And Wage Practices Of Concessionaires At Daniel K. Inouye International Airport.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-10HouseReferred to LAB/TRN, FIN, referral sheet 39
2020-02-28HouseOffered
2020-02-27HouseTo be offered.

Same As/Similar To

HR45 (Same As) 2020-03-10 - Referred to LAB/TRN, FIN, referral sheet 39
HCR60 (Carry Over) 2019-04-09 - Referred to TRS.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback