HI HCR6 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HCR6
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 46-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-26 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 46-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-26 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The United States Department Of Defense To Prepare A Plan To Decommission The Red Hill Bulk Fuel Storage Facility, Store Its Fuel Away From The Southern Oahu Basal Aquifer In A Manner Compliant With Federal And State Law, Prepare A Plan To Establish A New Water Treatment Facility, Pay For All Costs To The State, And Comply With All Future Remediation Efforts.
Title
Requesting The United States Department Of Defense To Prepare A Plan To Decommission The Red Hill Bulk Fuel Storage Facility, Store Its Fuel Away From The Southern Oahu Basal Aquifer In A Manner Compliant With Federal And State Law, Prepare A Plan To Establish A New Water Treatment Facility, Pay For All Costs To The State, And Comply With All Future Remediation Efforts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-20 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-20 - Senate - Senate Health: Passed, Unamended (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-18 - House - House Energy & Environmental Protection: Passed, Unamended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-18 - House - House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-20 - Senate - Senate Health: Passed, Unamended (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-18 - House - House Energy & Environmental Protection: Passed, Unamended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-18 - House - House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-26 | House | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2022-04-26 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 912). |
2022-04-26 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House. |
2022-04-25 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-26-22. |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Reported from HTH/PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 4062) with recommendation of adoption. |
2022-04-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, DeCoite, Baker, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2022-04-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HTH were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Moriwaki, San Buenaventura; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Keohokalole, Fevella. |
2022-04-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH/PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 04-20-22 10:00AM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference. |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Re-Referred to HTH/PSM. |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Referred to HTH/WTL/PSM. |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 411). |
2022-04-07 | House | Transmitted to Senate. |
2022-04-07 | House | Adopted as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Costales, D. Kobayashi, Nishimoto excused (3). |
2022-04-07 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1763-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending adoption. |
2022-04-05 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Kitagawa, Hashem, Kong, Mizuno, Morikawa, Onishi, Tarnas, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino, Har. |
2022-04-01 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by CPC on Tuesday, 04-05-22 2:00PM in conference room 329 Via Videoconference. |
2022-03-28 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Lowen excused (1). |
2022-03-28 | House | Reported from HHH/EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1472-22), recommending referral to CPC. |
2022-02-18 | House | The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Marten, Hashem, Matayoshi, Todd, Tokioka, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Perruso. |
2022-02-18 | House | The committees on HHH recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Tam, Gates, Har, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Kapela, Nishimoto. |
2022-02-15 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by HHH/EEP on Friday, 02-18-22 10:00AM in conference room 329 Via Videoconference. |
2022-01-28 | House | Referred to HHH/EEP, CPC, referral sheet 3 |
2022-01-28 | House | Offered |
2022-01-26 | House | To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HR2 (Same As) 2022-04-07 - Resolution adopted in final form.
HCR6 (Carry Over) 2021-03-19 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on JHA with Representative(s) Okimoto voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Todd excused (1).
HCR6 (Carry Over) 2021-03-19 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on JHA with Representative(s) Okimoto voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Todd excused (1).
Subjects
Decommission
Red Hill Bulk Fuel Storage Facility
Remediation
Southern Oahu Basal Aquifer
United States Department of Defense
United States Navy
Red Hill Bulk Fuel Storage Facility
Remediation
Southern Oahu Basal Aquifer
United States Department of Defense
United States Navy