HI HCR59 | 2020 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous HCR59

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-10 - Referred to LHE, FIN, referral sheet 39
Pending: House Lower and Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Encouraging The Department Of Education, Complex Areas, And Charter Schools To Implement School-wide Restorative Justice Practices In The State's Public And Charter Schools.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Encouraging The Department Of Education, Complex Areas, And Charter Schools To Implement School-wide Restorative Justice Practices In The State's Public And Charter Schools.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-10HouseReferred to LHE, FIN, referral sheet 39
2020-02-28HouseOffered
2020-02-27HouseTo be offered.

Same As/Similar To

HR44 (Same As) 2020-03-10 - Referred to LHE, FIN, referral sheet 39
HCR59 (Carry Over) 2019-03-14 - Referred to EEP/LMG, FIN, referral sheet 33

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback