HI HCR58 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HCR58
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-29 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, Oshiro, Say, Thielen excused (4).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-29 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, Oshiro, Say, Thielen excused (4).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Governor To Approve The Establishment Of A Sister State-province Relationship Between The State Of Hawaii And The Province Of Henan Of The People's Republic Of China.
Title
Requesting The Governor To Approve The Establishment Of A Sister State-province Relationship Between The State Of Hawaii And The Province Of Henan Of The People's Republic Of China.
Sponsors
Rep. Calvin Say [D] | Rep. Isaac Choy [D] | Rep. Ken Ito [D] | Rep. Sam Kong [D] |
Rep. Marcus Oshiro [D] | Rep. James Tokioka [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-29 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, Oshiro, Say, Thielen excused (4). |
2017-03-29 | House | Reported from VMI (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1524), recommending referral to FIN. |
2017-03-16 | House | The committees on VMI recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Ito, Tokioka, Cachola, Choy, Ohno, Woodson, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Onishi. |
2017-03-13 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by VMI on Thursday, 03-16-17 9:30AM in conference room 429. |
2017-02-22 | House | Referred to VMI, FIN, referral sheet 24 |
2017-02-22 | House | Offered |
2017-02-21 | House | To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HCR58 (Carry Over) 2017-03-29 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, Oshiro, Say, Thielen excused (4).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HCR&billnumber=58&year=2017 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2017/bills/HCR58_.HTM |