HI HCR57 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HCR57
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Introduced on March 9 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-23 - The committee(s) on CMV recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Corrections, Military, & Veterans Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 9 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-23 - The committee(s) on CMV recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Corrections, Military, & Veterans Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Expressing Support For The Naming Of A United States Navy Surface Combatant Ship After Fireman Second Class And Congressional Medal Of Honor Recipient Telesforo Trinidad.
Title
Expressing Support For The Naming Of A United States Navy Surface Combatant Ship After Fireman Second Class And Congressional Medal Of Honor Recipient Telesforo Trinidad.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-23 | House | The committee(s) on CMV recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2022-03-21 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by CMV on Wednesday, 03-23-22 10:30AM in conference room 430 Via Videoconference. |
2022-03-14 | House | Referred to CMV, JHA, referral sheet 27 |
2022-03-10 | House | Offered |
2022-03-09 | House | To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HR51 (Same As) 2022-03-23 - The committee(s) on CMV recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
HCR57 (Carry Over) 2021-03-24 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Okimoto voting no (1) and none excused (0).
SCR37 (Same As) 2022-04-18 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ohno, Woodson excused (2).
HCR57 (Carry Over) 2021-03-24 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Okimoto voting no (1) and none excused (0).
SCR37 (Same As) 2022-04-18 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ohno, Woodson excused (2).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HCR&billnumber=57&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/HCR57_.HTM |