HI HCR57 | 2020 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous HCR57

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-10 - Referred to EEP, FIN, referral sheet 39
Pending: House Energy & Environmental Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Declaring A Climate Emergency And Requesting Statewide Collaboration Toward An Immediate Just Transition And Emergency Mobilization Effort To Restore A Safe Climate.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Declaring A Climate Emergency And Requesting Statewide Collaboration Toward An Immediate Just Transition And Emergency Mobilization Effort To Restore A Safe Climate.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-10HouseReferred to EEP, FIN, referral sheet 39
2020-02-28HouseOffered
2020-02-27HouseTo be offered.

Same As/Similar To

HR42 (Same As) 2020-03-10 - Referred to EEP, FIN, referral sheet 39
HCR57 (Carry Over) 2019-03-27 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Creagan, DeCoite, Holt, McKelvey excused (4).

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback