HI HCR55 | 2020 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous HCR55

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 26 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-10 - Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 39
Pending: House Labor & Public Employment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requesting The Director Of Labor And Industrial Relations To Convene A Working Group To Explore The Provision Of Paid Family Leave For Executive Departments That Report Directly To The Governor.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requesting The Director Of Labor And Industrial Relations To Convene A Working Group To Explore The Provision Of Paid Family Leave For Executive Departments That Report Directly To The Governor.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-10HouseReferred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 39
2020-02-27HouseOffered
2020-02-26HouseTo be offered.

Same As/Similar To

HR40 (Same As) 2020-03-10 - Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 39
HCR55 (Carry Over) 2019-05-02 - Resolution adopted in final form.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback