HI HCR54 | 2020 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous HCR54

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 26 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-10 - Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 39
Pending: House Labor & Public Employment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Recognizing The Fiftieth Anniversary Of The Enactment Of Chapter 89, Hawaii Revised Statutes, And Urging The Hawaii Labor Relations Board To Construe Chapter 89, Hawaii Revised Statutes, In Accordance With Tradition.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Recognizing The Fiftieth Anniversary Of The Enactment Of Chapter 89, Hawaii Revised Statutes, And Urging The Hawaii Labor Relations Board To Construe Chapter 89, Hawaii Revised Statutes, In Accordance With Tradition.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-10HouseReferred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 39
2020-02-27HouseOffered
2020-02-26HouseTo be offered.

Same As/Similar To

HR39 (Same As) 2020-03-10 - Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 39
HCR54 (Carry Over) 2019-03-14 - Referred to LAB/AGR, FIN, referral sheet 33

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback