HI HCR53 | 2020 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous HCR53

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-10 - Referred to TRN/EEP, FIN, referral sheet 39
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requesting The Hawaii Climate Change Mitigation And Adaptation Commission To Convene An Electric Vehicles Task Force To Study The Feasibility Of A Complete Transition To Electric Vehicles By The Year 2050.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requesting The Hawaii Climate Change Mitigation And Adaptation Commission To Convene An Electric Vehicles Task Force To Study The Feasibility Of A Complete Transition To Electric Vehicles By The Year 2050.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-10HouseReferred to TRN/EEP, FIN, referral sheet 39
2020-02-27HouseOffered
2020-02-26HouseTo be offered.

Same As/Similar To

HR38 (Same As) 2020-03-10 - Referred to TRN/EEP, FIN, referral sheet 39
HCR53 (Carry Over) 2019-03-14 - Referred to LHE/HLT, FIN, referral sheet 33

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback