HI HCR52 | 2020 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous HCR52

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-16 - This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Wednesday 03-18-20 10:00AM in conference room 325.
Pending: House Water, Land, & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Urging The Department Of Land And Natural Resources To Convene A Task Force Of Government And Private Stakeholders To Identify Long-term Solutions To Control And Eradicate Albizia In Hawaii.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Urging The Department Of Land And Natural Resources To Convene A Task Force Of Government And Private Stakeholders To Identify Long-term Solutions To Control And Eradicate Albizia In Hawaii.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-16HouseThis measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Wednesday 03-18-20 10:00AM in conference room 325.
2020-03-13HouseResolution scheduled to be heard by WLH on Wednesday, 03-18-20 10:00AM in conference room 325.
2020-03-10HouseReferred to WLH, FIN, referral sheet 39
2020-02-27HouseOffered
2020-02-21HouseTo be offered.

Same As/Similar To

HR37 (Same As) 2020-03-10 - Referred to WLH, FIN, referral sheet 39
HCR52 (Carry Over) 2019-04-09 - Referred to TRS.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback