HI HCR51 | 2020 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous HCR51

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-10 - Referred to LHE/EEP, FIN, referral sheet 39
Pending: House Lower and Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Urging The University Of Hawaii System And The Department Of Education To Include Training, Courses, And Curriculum Related To The Mechanics, Repair, And Maintenance Of Electric Vehicles, Hydrogen Vehicles, And Other Alternative Fuel Vehicles In Its School Programs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Urging The University Of Hawaii System And The Department Of Education To Include Training, Courses, And Curriculum Related To The Mechanics, Repair, And Maintenance Of Electric Vehicles, Hydrogen Vehicles, And Other Alternative Fuel Vehicles In Its School Programs.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-10HouseReferred to LHE/EEP, FIN, referral sheet 39
2020-02-27HouseOffered
2020-02-20HouseTo be offered.

Same As/Similar To

HR36 (Same As) 2020-03-10 - Referred to LHE/EEP, FIN, referral sheet 39
HCR51 (Carry Over) 2019-03-14 - Referred to TIA, FIN, referral sheet 33

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback