HI HCR5 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-2)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-28 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, C. Lee excused (2).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requesting Members Of The United States Congress To Amend Federal Law To Ensure That Victims Of Sexual Harassment And Sexual Assault Who Might Otherwise Be Forced Into Arbitration And Silence Instead Have Access To The Courts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requesting Members Of The United States Congress To Amend Federal Law To Ensure That Victims Of Sexual Harassment And Sexual Assault Who Might Otherwise Be Forced Into Arbitration And Silence Instead Have Access To The Courts.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-28HouseReport adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, C. Lee excused (2).
2019-03-28HouseReported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1897), recommending referral to FIN.
2019-03-20HouseThe committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Creagan, Lowen, Morikawa, Say, Takayama, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Brower, McKelvey, Yamane.
2019-03-18HouseResolution scheduled to be heard by JUD on Wednesday, 03-20-19 2:15PM in conference room 325.
2019-02-11HouseReferred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 20
2019-01-22HouseOffered
2019-01-18HouseTo be offered.

Same As/Similar To

HR6 (Same As) 2019-03-28 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, C. Lee excused (2).

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback