HI HCR49 | 2020 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous HCR49

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-10 - Referred to HSH, CPC, referral sheet 39
Pending: House Human Services & Homelessness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requesting The Department Of Commerce And Consumer Affairs To Convene A Dental Assistant Working Group To Develop And Recommend Certification Requirements For Dental Assistants.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requesting The Department Of Commerce And Consumer Affairs To Convene A Dental Assistant Working Group To Develop And Recommend Certification Requirements For Dental Assistants.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-10HouseReferred to HSH, CPC, referral sheet 39
2020-02-27HouseOffered
2020-02-19HouseTo be offered.

Same As/Similar To

HR34 (Same As) 2020-03-10 - Referred to HSH, CPC, referral sheet 39
HCR49 (Carry Over) 2019-03-25 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Creagan, Eli, Holt, Nakamura, Quinlan excused (6).

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback