HI HCR49 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HCR49
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-13 - Referred to HHS, FIN, referral sheet 39
Pending: House Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-13 - Referred to HHS, FIN, referral sheet 39
Pending: House Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Human Services And The Governor's Coordinator On Homelessness To Consider Entering Into Additional Contracts With Provider Agencies To Open Additional Temporary Homeless Shelters In Waipahu.
Title
Requesting The Department Of Human Services And The Governor's Coordinator On Homelessness To Consider Entering Into Additional Contracts With Provider Agencies To Open Additional Temporary Homeless Shelters In Waipahu.
Sponsors
Sen. Henry Aquino [D] | Rep. Ty Cullen [D] | Rep. Roy Takumi [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-13 | House | Referred to HHS, FIN, referral sheet 39 |
2018-03-02 | House | Offered |
2018-03-01 | House | To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HR37 (Same As) 2018-03-13 - Referred to HHS, FIN, referral sheet 39
HCR49 (Carry Over) 2017-02-22 - Referred to EDN, HLT, referral sheet 23
HCR49 (Carry Over) 2017-02-22 - Referred to EDN, HLT, referral sheet 23
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HCR&billnumber=49&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/HCR49_.HTM |