HI HCR48 | 2020 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous HCR48

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-16 - This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Tuesday 03-17-20 8:30AM in conference room 329.
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Urging The United States Congress To Keep The American People Safe And Healthy By Decreasing The Nation's Dependency On Foreign Manufactured Pharmaceutical Ingredients And Medicine, Particularly From China

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Urging The United States Congress To Keep The American People Safe And Healthy By Decreasing The Nation's Dependency On Foreign Manufactured Pharmaceutical Ingredients And Medicine, Particularly From China

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-16HouseThis measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Tuesday 03-17-20 8:30AM in conference room 329.
2020-03-12HouseResolution scheduled to be heard by HLT on Tuesday, 03-17-20 8:30AM in conference room 329.
2020-03-10HouseReferred to HLT, CPC, referral sheet 39
2020-02-27HouseOffered
2020-02-19HouseTo be offered.

Same As/Similar To

HCR48 (Carry Over) 2019-03-28 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, C. Lee excused (2).

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback