HI HCR48 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HCR48
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-28 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, C. Lee excused (2).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-28 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, C. Lee excused (2).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The Department Of Land And Natural Resources To Manage The Waianae Kai Forest And Restore Water Flow In Waianae Streams For Native Hawaiian Traditional And Customary Practices And Implementation Of The Waianae Kai Wildfire Preparedness Plan.
Title
Urging The Department Of Land And Natural Resources To Manage The Waianae Kai Forest And Restore Water Flow In Waianae Streams For Native Hawaiian Traditional And Customary Practices And Implementation Of The Waianae Kai Wildfire Preparedness Plan.
Sponsors
Rep. Cedric Gates [D] | Rep. Tom Brower [D] | Rep. Daniel Holt [D] | Rep. Sean Quinlan [D] |
Rep. Chris Todd [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-28 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, C. Lee excused (2). |
2019-03-28 | House | Reported from WLH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1841), recommending referral to FIN. |
2019-03-27 | House | The committees on WLH recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Todd, Tarnas, Wildberger, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Har, Lowen. |
2019-03-22 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by WLH on Wednesday, 03-27-19 9:30AM in conference room 325. |
2019-03-14 | House | Referred to WLH, FIN, referral sheet 33 |
2019-03-07 | House | Offered |
2019-03-06 | House | To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HCR48 (Carry Over) 2019-03-28 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, C. Lee excused (2).
HR46 (Same As) 2019-03-28 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, C. Lee excused (2).
HR46 (Same As) 2019-03-28 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, C. Lee excused (2).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HCR&billnumber=48&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/HCR48_.HTM |