HI HCR45 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HCR45
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-20 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-20 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The United States Congress To Grant Additional Authority To The Federal Communications Commission To Stop Unwanted And Illegal Robocalls.
Title
Urging The United States Congress To Grant Additional Authority To The Federal Communications Commission To Stop Unwanted And Illegal Robocalls.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-09 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, Unamended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, Unamended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-20 | House | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Received notice of Adoption in House (Hse. Com. No. 607). |
2021-04-20 | House | Adopted as amended in SD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1). |
2021-04-20 | House | House agrees to Senate amendment(s). |
2021-04-16 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 798) in amended form (SD 1). |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House. |
2021-04-15 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-16-21. |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1742) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2021-04-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Chang, Misalucha, Riviere, San Buenaventura, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara. |
2021-04-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 04-09-21 9:15AM; CR 229 & Videoconference. |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Referred to CPN. |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 329). |
2021-03-30 | House | Transmitted to Senate. |
2021-03-30 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Todd excused (1). |
2021-03-30 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1527), recommending adoption. |
2021-03-19 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Kitagawa, Har, Hashem, Kong, Mizuno, Morikawa, Onishi, Tarnas, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino. |
2021-03-17 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by CPC on Friday, 03-19-21 2:00PM in conference room 329 Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-24 | House | Referred to CPC, referral sheet 18 |
2021-02-23 | House | Offered |
2021-02-22 | House | To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HCR45 (Carry Over) 2021-04-20 - Resolution adopted in final form.
HR36 (Same As) 2021-03-31 - Resolution adopted in final form.
HR36 (Same As) 2021-03-31 - Resolution adopted in final form.