HI HCR40 | 2020 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous HCR40

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-10 - Referred to TRN, JUD, referral sheet 39
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Urging The Police Department Of Each County To Strictly Enforce Any Applicable County Regulations Governing The Use Of Stickers Or Decals On Motor Vehicle Windows Or Windshields And Urging The Department Of Transportation To Require All Official Safety Inspection Stations To Strictly Enforce These County Regulations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Urging The Police Department Of Each County To Strictly Enforce Any Applicable County Regulations Governing The Use Of Stickers Or Decals On Motor Vehicle Windows Or Windshields And Urging The Department Of Transportation To Require All Official Safety Inspection Stations To Strictly Enforce These County Regulations.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-10HouseReferred to TRN, JUD, referral sheet 39
2020-02-11HouseOffered
2020-02-10HouseTo be offered.

Same As/Similar To

HR23 (Same As) 2020-03-10 - Referred to TRN, JUD, referral sheet 39
HCR40 (Carry Over) 2019-03-14 - Referred to WLH, FIN, referral sheet 33

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback